APOPO UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To fund innovative projects and innovation that enables assistance through animal scent detection. By establishing networks, collaboration and developing partnerships with those working in the field, we help to provide solutions addressing social challenges ie through land mine detection, TB detection, disaster search & rescue and illegal animal trafficking, soil pollution, around the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Angola
- Azerbaijan
- Belgium
- Cambodia
- Ethiopia
- Mozambique
- Scotland
- Senegal
- South Sudan
- Switzerland
- Tanzania
- Turkey
- Ukraine
- United States
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 18 May 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Robertson | Chair | 19 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Yasmine Colijn | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Mark Unsworth | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alan Harry Angus MacDonald OBE | Trustee | 31 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Cameron Watson | Trustee | 17 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Justin John Henniker Bedingfeld | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Alan John Mathers | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19 AUG 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 JUN 2021
Charitable objects
5 THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 5.1 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH; ; AND 5.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION MAINLY THOUGH NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY MAKING GRANTS OR OTHER FUNDING IN RESPECT OF PROJECTS INVOLVING SCENT DETECTION ANIMALS THAT PROTECT PEOPLE AND THE PLANET IN PARTICULAR TO BENEFIT LOWER INCOME AND VULNERABLE COMMUNITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUITE 3
PEEL HOUSE CHESHIRE
30 THE DOWNS
ALTRINCHAM
WA14 2PX
- Phone:
- 07508363332
- Email:
- apopouk@apopo.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window