FRIENDS OF PERSHORE HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 15 September 2021: CIO registration
- 27 March 2025: Funds received from 502273 FRIENDS OF PERSHORE HOSPITAL
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Jane Hodges | Chair | 05 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julie Nina Everett | Trustee | 30 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jane Hakesley | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Susan Garratt | Trustee | 15 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Christopher Nixon | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Stainton | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Linda Mary Hamlin | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr JUDITH MARY DALE | Trustee | 01 January 2009 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.64k | £16.47k | £13.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.61k | £61.92k | £50.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 11 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 March 2025 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 March 2025 | 129 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 March 2025 | 493 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 March 2025 | 493 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, (I) TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHERS IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, (II) TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE HOSPITAL AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING CARE FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND (III) TO UNDERTAKE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES WHICH CONTRIBUTE TO THE HEALTH AND WELLBEING OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Pershore Hospital
Queen Elizabeth House
Queen Elizabeth Drive
PERSHORE
WR10 1PS
- Phone:
- 07511771004
- Email:
- treasurerFOPH@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window