TEESSIDE AIRPORT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teesside Airport Foundation is a fundraising charity which exists to support the people of Darlington, Hartlepool, Middlesbrough, Redcar and Cleveland and Stockton-on-Tees to achieve their ambitions in education and employment and to assist in the regeneration of the area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Darlington
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 10 May 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Beverley Boden | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Waine | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Nicholls | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Raymond Robinson | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Cumiskey | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tristan Zipfel | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Dixon | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.13k | £2.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.46k | £1.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 MAR 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYS OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE WHO ARE WORKING IN OR RESIDENT OF THE AREA:- THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED DUE TO FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES; AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED DUE TO FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER SOCIAL AND/OR ECONOMIC DISADVANTAGE, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, BY IMPROVING SUCH PERSONS ABILITY TO ACCESS AND BENEFIT FROM EDUCATIONAL, EMPLOYMENT AND/OR SELF-EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES, INCLUDING THROUGH DEVELOPMENT OF THEIR SKILLS AND CAPACITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
TEES VALLEY COMBINED AUTHORITY
Teesside Airport Business Suite
Teesside International Airport
Darlington
DL2 1NJ
- Phone:
- 01642524400
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window