Trustees SORBY NATURAL HISTORY SOCIETY SHEFFIELD
Charity number: 518234

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gerard Joseph Firkins | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Boyce | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Keith Darby | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Antony Butterfield | Trustee | 29 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Pablo Flanagan | Trustee | 29 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Derek Whiteley | Trustee | 30 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
ALISTAIR SCOTT MCLEAN | Trustee | 01 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL HOLMES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANTHONY BRIAN LOY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT JAMES CROXTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL GEORGE ARCHER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.