CHELSEA GROUP OF CHILDREN CHARITY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This is a charity created for a school Parent-Teacher's Association for Chelsea Group of Children (recently renamed the Chelsea Hall School), an independent primary school for children with special needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
Governance
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT AND PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: - 1. TO RAISE FUNDS AND DONATIONS FOR ASSISTING THE CHELSEA GROUP FOR CHILDREN SCHOOL IN ENSURING BETTER EDUCATION DELIVERY TO ITS PUPILS 2. TO CREATE MORE AWARENESS FOR CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS AND DISABILITIES 3. TO ADVANCE AN ENABLING ENVIRONMENT FOR PARENTS AND TEACHERS OF CHELSEA GROUP FOR CHILDREN TO SUPPORT AND IMPROVE THE LIVES OF ITS PUPILS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window