Accounts and annual returns SHABACH PRAISE MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1195150
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 20 March 2024 18 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 20 March 2024 18 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 March 2023 13 August 2024 206 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 March 2023 13 August 2024 206 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 20 March 2022 04 March 2023 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 20 March 2022 13 August 2024 571 days late Download Open in new window