THE BATH CAMERATA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Allocate grants to advance the education of the public in the appreciation of music; in particular music for chorus, choir, vocal consort or solo voices.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 14 June 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alastair Steel | Chair | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Julian Kern | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Trist | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Baker | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.67k | £10.30k | £20.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.34k | £27 | £2.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 February 2025 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 107 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 SEP 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION OF MUSIC; IN PARTICULAR MUSIC FOR CHORUS, CHOIR, VOCAL CONSORT OR SOLO VOICES IN ALL ITS ASPECTS AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 WINDSOR COTTAGES
SHAM CASTLE LANE
BATH
BA2 6JH
- Phone:
- 01225484474
- Email:
- Trust@bathcamerata.org.uk
- Website:
-
Trust.Bathcamerata.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window