LEG-UP CHARITY FOR KIDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity operates to make grants/donations for such purposes as are charitable according to the laws of England and Wales for the following purposes: The advancement of education of students Relief of those who are in need by reason of their youth, age, ill-health or disability, financial hardship/other disadvantage To other registered charities in furtherance of their charitable purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 December 2021: CIO registration
- "LUCK" (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea Morrall | Chair | 16 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Natalie Joanne Leon | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Abrahams | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.37k | £105.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.15k | £2.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
TO MAKE GRANTS AND DONATIONS FOR SUCH PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: • THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS; • RELIEF OF THOSE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; • TO SUCH OTHER REGISTERED CHARITIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THEIR CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
221 Watling Street
Radlett
Hertfordshire
WD7 7AJ
- Phone:
- 02071834932
- Email:
- am@luck.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window