ESME'S UMBRELLA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Esme's Umbrella raises awareness of Charles Bonnet Syndrome to all healthcare professionals and out into the community. Offering up-to-date information about CBS, creating ways to support people who develop the condition and sourcing funding for research, the charity plays a vital role in reassuring and supporting adults and children who develop CBS after losing 60% of sight.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Dominic Hannes ffytche | Chair | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Anne Potts | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Mariya Fakhrudin Fidahusen Moosajee | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Khan | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.36k | £14.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.20k | £6.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF ALL AGES IN THE UK, WHOSE LOSS OF SIGHT HAS LED TO THE DEVELOPMENT OF CHARLES BONNET SYNDROME (CBS), BY: A) RAISING AWARENESS OF CBS TO HEALTHCARE PROFESSIONALS AND THE WIDER COMMUNITY B) CREATING SUPPORT FOR THE CARE AND WELFARE OF ANYONE WHO DEVELOPS CBS AND THEIR FAMILIES/CAREGIVERS C) SOURCING AND RAISING FUNDING FOR CBS RESEARCH AND TO PUBLISH ALL USEFUL RESULTS ARISING FROM THE RESEARCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Western Gardens
LONDON
W5 3RU
- Phone:
- 07793594738
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window