THE TURNER-KIRK TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Turner Kirk Trust is a family foundation that supports science, technology, engineering, mathematics, conservation & biodiversity, and early childhood development causes in the UK and developing world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Malawi
Governance
- 20 August 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Patricia Jane Turner | Chair | 20 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ewan McKinnon Kirk | Trustee | 20 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £250.00k | £250.00k | £201.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.40k | £235.91k | £358.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 24 March 2025 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 24 March 2025 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 Aug 2021 as amended on 19 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE TO PAY OR APPLY THE CAPITAL AND INCOME HELD BY THE CIO TO OR TOWARDS OR FOR THE BENEFIT OR FURTHERANCE OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OR CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS (WHETHER CORPORATE OR UNINCORPORATED) AT SUCH TIME, IN SUCH MANNER AND IN SUCH PROPORTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Turner-Kirk Trust
Stonecross
Trumpington High Street
Cambridge
CB2 9SU
- Phone:
- 07885488479
- Email:
- contact@turner-kirk.org
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window