OHEL SHOLOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provisional of a synagogue and related services
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Manchester City
- Salford City
Governance
- 09 August 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yehuda Zev Halpern | Chair | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Uri Pawlowski | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shloime Solomon Steven Graff | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.53k | £138.97k | £124.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.23k | £106.57k | £107.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 30 April 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18 JUN 2020
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION WORLDWIDE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CODE OF JEWISH LAW (SHULCHAN ARUCH), IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY RUNNING A SYNAGOGUE AND PROVIDING FOR THE RELIGIOUS NEEDS, SPIRITUAL EDUCATION, PASTORAL NEEDS AND WELFARE OF ITS MEMBERS AND OF OTHER MEMBERS OF THE JEWISH COMMUNITY; (2) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
111 RICO HOUSE
GEORGE STREET
PRESTWICH
MANCHESTER
M25 9WS
- Phone:
- 07962067458
- Email:
- ssgraff@live.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window