FOREVER FINLEY


Charity overview
Regulatory alerts
-
Notice of dissolution on application of the CIO (see details)
The Commission intends to dissolve this CIO after three months from the date of this notice unless cause is shown to the contrary. Representations must be made to the Commission within three months. Email your representation to CIOnotices@charitycommission.gov.uk
Quote the charity number and head the email 'CIO dissolution representation'.
Notice dated: 21 March 2025
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Forever Finley provide bereaved parents with memory making, primarily 3D hand and foot casts in Essex, Kent and Suffolk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 18 October 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Smith | Chair | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Smith | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Elliott | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.96k | £24.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.96k | £24.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND EMOTIONAL DISTRESS OF PARENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED THE LOSS OF A CHILD THROUGH ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF CREATING MEMORIES PRIMARILY BY PROVIDING 3D HAND AND FOOT CASTS IN MEMORY OF FINLEY WILLIAM SMITH, 19 JANUARY 2018.
Contact information
- Address:
-
White Elm Garden Centre
White Elm Road
Danbury
CHELMSFORD
CM3 4LR
- Phone:
- 07875001130
- Email:
- foreverfinley@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window