Trustees CROXTETH PARK VOLUNTEER GROUP

Charity number: 1194839
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christine Beyga Chair 17 January 2017
None on record
Steven Kelly Trustee 24 June 2021
None on record
Karen Fairhurst Trustee 01 June 2018
None on record
Lynne Condell Trustee 02 February 2017
None on record
Carol Platt Trustee 01 February 2017
None on record
Patricia Helsby Trustee 01 February 2017
None on record
Anthony Beyga Trustee 02 January 2017
None on record