Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF PENNY LANE ST BARNABAS
Charity number: 1194669

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Alexander Louis Rayment | Chair | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Hamilton | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew John Nixon | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Grace Robinson | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tania Gamble | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew Davison | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Bailey | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Burgess | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacob Vestergaard | Trustee | 24 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty White | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carys Anderson | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Jane Kaddour | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andres Enrique Florez Cardenas | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gordon Franklin | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.