MOBILE SMILES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
o To improve oral health and provide better access to dental care in areas worldwide through mobile dental vans and static clinics. o This will benefit those who have restricted access to dentistry. o Preventative and teaching programmes will be set up in these areas to help improve the general oral health of these populations. o Oral cancer screening
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Namibia
Governance
- 17 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mariam Ramy Ramzy Ghobrial | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Ragai Sami Fakhoury | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Magdy Fouad El-Khanagry | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Wageeh Maurice Fawzy Mikhail | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rafik George Nassif Hebeish | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Nasr Sami Wanis | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.60k | £43.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £502 | £27.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 February 2025 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 20 February 2025 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 September 2024 | 209 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 September 2024 | 209 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND FOR THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE HEALTH OF THE INHABITANT OF EGYPT INITIALLY, AND OTHER COUNTRIES IN THE FUTURE, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF A DENTAL CLINIC OR CLINICS FOR THE TREATMENT OF SUCH PERSONS AND BY ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS CONCERNING DENTAL HEALTH. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 SPRING GROVE CRESCENT
HOUNSLOW
TW3 4DB
- Phone:
- 07859076473
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window