Trustees SALESIAN HEARTS ADVOCATING THE RELIEF OF POVERTY BY EDUCATION (KNOWN BY THE ACRONYM SHARE)
Charity number: 1197901

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Williams MA | Chair | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philomena DSa | Trustee | 05 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kay Morley-Cooper | Trustee | 22 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Noble | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev JAMES ROBERT GARDNER SDB | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Owens | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria Morrison | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Maher MA | Trustee | 14 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Haworth-Edwards | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.