FRIENDS OF CHOSEN YESHIAS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(1) the advancement of the orthodox Jewish faith, (2) the prevention or relief of poverty, and (3) the relief of those in need, by reason of age, ill-health, disability, financial hardship or other disadvantage of people living in the UK and Israel, in particular but not exclusively, by financially supporting such charitable purposes as are charitable in UK law.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Israel
Governance
- 26 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABRAHAM SCHREIBER | Chair | 26 November 2021 |
|
|||||||||
MEYER WAHRHAFTIG | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|||||||||
Schlomo Rosenfeld | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.74k | £325.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.56k | £325.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 November 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 November 2024 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH, (2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, AND (3) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE UK AND ISRAEL, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY FINANCIALLY SUPPORTING SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE IN UK LAW OF SUCH ORGANISATIONS REGISTERED AS CHARITIES IN THE UK AND ISRAEL AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
24A LINGWOOD ROAD
LONDON
E5 9BN
- Phone:
- 07825705097
- Email:
- yossi@ajsaccounts.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window