Accounts and annual returns DARLINGTON ASSOCIATION ON DISABILITY

Charity number: 518265
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2008 12 May 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 25 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 25 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 26 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 20 February 2006 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 24 February 2006 24 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 21 January 2005 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 21 January 2005 On Time