SIKH DOCTORS AND DENTISTS ASSOCIATION (UK)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
medical education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 January 2022: CIO registration
- SDDA (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Harmohan Singh Narula | Chair | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maninder Singh Kalkat | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harcharan Singh Sahni | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.62k | £1.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.14k | £1.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 14 December 2024 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | 14 December 2024 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 247 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 247 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH IN THE UK, IN PARTICULAR BY A) THE PROVISION OF HEALTHCARE PROJECTS FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY; B) EDUCATING AND RAISING AWARENESS OF HEALTH MATTERS; C) EDUCATING AND TRAINING THE COMMUNITY ON THE APPROPRIATE USE OF MEDICAL AND NON-MEDICAL EQUIPMENT FOR SAVING LIVES AND FIRST AID MANAGEMENT. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SIKH RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Stroud Practice
Bentley Health Centre
Churchill Road
Walsall
WS2 0BA
- Phone:
- 01922423580
- Email:
- sukhpal.gill@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window