THE TODMORDEN MEDICAL CENTRE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 518266
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Todmorden Medical Centre Charitable Trust does not do any active fundraising. Funds are usually by donation.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £94
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Calderdale

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 December 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr NIGEL PETER DAVEY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21 £0 £19 £104 £94
Total expenditure £1 £2.54k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 02 July 2024 153 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 01 February 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
TODMORDEN HEALTH CENTRE
LOWER GEORGE STREET
TODMORDEN
OL14 5RN
Phone:
01706811100