XLH UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
XLH UK exists to help those with X-linked hypophosphatemia (XLH) and their families living in the UK. We organise events and maintain a website with resources and news. We raise awareness by sharing stories of the lived experience. We also contribute to research into the multiple aspects of this rare condition, to better inform the development of new treatments and standards for best care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Jersey
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 29 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Mitson | Chair | 12 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Claire Jayne Lewis | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sally Hatton | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Oliver Gardiner | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.08k | £18.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.54k | £24.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 29 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG SUFFERERS OF X-LINKED HYPOPHOSPHATEMIA AND RELATED DISORDERS BY: A) SUPPORTING RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INTO THE CAUSES, PREVENTION, DIAGNOSIS AND METHODS OF TREATMENT OF X-LINKED HYPOPHOSPHATEMIA AND RELATED DISORDERS AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS OF THAT RESEARCH; B) PROVISION OF A SUPPORT NETWORK FOR FAMILIES SUFFERING FROM THE EFFECTS OF X-LINKED HYPOPHOSPHATEMIA AND RELATED DISORDERS; C) ADVOCATING EARLY DIAGNOSIS AND WELL-MANAGED TREATMENT OF X-LINKED HYPOPHOSPHATEMIA AND RELATED DISORDERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61A Bridge Street
KINGTON
Herefordshire
HR5 3DJ
- Phone:
- 07905115944
- Email:
- contact@xlhuk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window