SEMUSIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SEMusic currently runs St. Edmund's Choir and #LoveToSing children's choir in Waterloo, Liverpool. Both choirs are free of charge to join and are non-auditioning - SEMusic takes pride on making the arts accessible to all. SEMusic produces events to help fund the work of the choirs and uses music and an education resource.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
Governance
- 02 November 2021: Standard registration
- ST EDMUNDS CHOIR (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Snell | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Boyle | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacquelyn Anne Williams | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Imelda Bernadine Morrison | Trustee | 03 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Daniels | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Iain Dolan | Trustee | 03 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Wainwright | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sophie McQueen | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.50k | £991 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.68k | £358 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 November 2024 | 302 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 JUN 2021 AS AMENDED ON 20 OCT 2021
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN, IMPROVE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION, PARTICULARLY MUSICAL EDUCATION, AND FOR THIS PURPOSE TO ENCOURAGE THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF MUSIC, DRAMA, DANCE AND SINGING. 2. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES WHICH PROMOTE THE PRACTICE OR ENJOYMENT OF THE ART OF MUSIC FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION AND TO MAKE THEM AVAILABLE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 OXFORD ROAD
WATERLOO
LIVERPOOL
L22 8QF
- Phone:
- 07539380383
- Email:
- ben@semusic.org.uk
- Website:
-
semusic.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window