Governing document CLWYD BADGER GROUP/CYMDEITHAS MOCH DAEAR CLWYD
Charity Number: 518271

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MARCH 1986 AS AMENDED 2 SEPTEMBER 1986, 2 JUNE 1992, 3 APRIL 1993 AND 2 APRIL 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE STUDY AND CONSERVATION OF BADGERS AND TO PROTECT BADGERS ' HABITATS AND INTERESTS IN PRESENT AND FUTURE SETTS IN NORTH EAST WALES, IN CONJUNCTION WITH ANY BADGER GROUPS OPERATING IN THIS AREA.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NORTH EAST WALES
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.