RAWDHATUL ILM EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rawdhatul ilm provides education for children. These classes take place weekday evenings and on the weekend. This includes the main tenants of religion, the Arabic language and reading. Other activities include; youth activities, family fun days, weekly Friday prayer meetings, Ramadhan prayers, community iftars and also Eid prayers and celebrations which unites the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 10 September 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faisal Uddin | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shazzadur Rahman | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kamal Uddin | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £208.10k | £162.94k | £165.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.79k | £178.84k | £130.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
1 .TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM IN TAMESIDE (UK) AND ELSEWHERE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON ISLAM TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE RELIGION OF ISLAM. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF ISLAM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. 3. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, AND IN PARTICULAR WITHIN TAMESIDE AND THE UNITED KINGDOM, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 CLOCK TOWER CLOSE
HYDE
SK14 1RS
- Phone:
- 07411547208
- Email:
- rawdhatulilm.uk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window