BUCKS BAME NETWORK

Charity number: 1198075
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We support BME individuals and associated groups and promote their activities - provide training and information to address disadvantage and lack of opportunity - support BME individuals in need of information, signposting and referral

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £150
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 February 2022: CIO registration
  • 17 February 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
  • 17 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1073861 BUCKINGHAMSHIRE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
  • 17 February 2025: Funds transferred to 1168036 SPARKLES - SUPPORTING CHILDREN WITH DOWN'S SYNDROM...
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2023
Total gross income £150
Total expenditure £0
Income from government contracts N/A
Income from government grants N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 October 2024 264 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 October 2024 264 days late
Submit annual return Open in new window