GARSTANG MEMORY CAFE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Memory cafes, also known as dementia cafes, provide safe spaces where people can go for a cup of tea and chat with experienced professionals or others affected by dementia. There are also games, quizzes and craft sessions which those attending can take part in along with outside speakers who invited to give talks.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 23 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDRA DENISE PERKINS | Chair | 24 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Christopher Legard Owens | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Jayne Evans | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Thomas Ryder | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Victor Sculfor | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Coppin | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Wilkinson | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.65k | £8.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.46k | £2.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NEED OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM DEMENTIA BY THE PROVISION OF A SAFE AND FRIENDLY BASE FOR MEETINGS OF CARERS AND THOSE LIVING WITH DEMENTIA TO ENABLE PARTICIPATION IN VARIED ACTIVITIES INCLUDING CRAFTS, MUSIC, TALKS ETC AND TO ENJOY INTERACTION WITH OTHERS IN SIMILAR CIRCUMSTANCES
Contact information
- Address:
-
PADDINGTON GREEN
28 WORCESTER AVENUE
GARSTANG
PADDINGTON GREEN
28 WORCESTER AVENUE
PR3 1EJ
- Phone:
- 01995471236
- Email:
- sandradperkins@sky.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window