HUDA ACADEMY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) To advance the religion of Islam by means of, but not exclusively, provision or assistance in the provision of facilities for worship and Islamic education (supplementary schools and nurseries). 2) To advance in life and relieve needs of young people through the provision of recreational activities and support. 3) To relieve financial hardship of poor people and victims of natural disasters.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kirklees
Governance
- 01 November 2021: CIO registration
- HUDA INSTITUTE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Yaqub Hussain | Trustee | 26 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD YUSUF | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
ABDULLAH MOHAMMEDALI PATEL | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED SARWAR | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr MOHIB AHMAD KHAN | Trustee | 12 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £197.59k | £291.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.98k | £300.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Nov 2021 as amended on 21 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROVISION OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP AND ISLAMIC EDUCATION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAN AND THE TEACHINGS OF PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PBUH) AS INTERPRETED AND ACCEPTED BY THE AHLE-SUNNAH WAL-JAMAA-AH AND EXPOUNDED BY THE SUNNI HANAFI SCHOOL OF THOUGHT; (2) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL RESOURCES, ACTIVITIES AND FACILITIES, SUCH AS SUPPLEMENTARY SCHOOLS AND NURSERIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF SAID PERSONS; (3) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH: (A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (4) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG POOR PEOPLE, VICTIMS OF NATURAL DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES, INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD, CLEAN WATER, AND OTHER BASIC NECESSITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MUSLIM COMMUNITY CENTRE
CLARE HILL
HUDDERSFIELD
HD1 5BS
- Phone:
- 07368520282
- Email:
- info_huda@clarehillcentre.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window