FRIENDS OF ST PETER & ST PAUL EWHURST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise funds to support repair and restoration projects at the historic, at risk, Grade 1 listed Church of St Peter & St Paul, Ewhurst in Surrey. We do this by building a donor/supporter database, organising events for our supporters and the wider community and also by raising awareness of the building's heritage through our website, educational church tours, and speaking to community groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 09 November 2021: Standard registration
- FRIENDS SPSP (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARY JANE HARRY | Chair | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony de Putron Gauvain | Trustee | 01 June 2024 |
|
|||||
Janet Mary Balchin | Trustee | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Clive Anthony Ward | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE HELEN AVERY | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Janice Margaret Allen | Trustee | 02 December 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.99k | £19.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £596 | £780 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 08 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, ARE: (1) TO PROMOTE THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND BEAUTIFICATION OF THE CHURCH BUILDING, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, MONUMENTS, FITTINGS, FIXTURES, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN THE CHURCH AND CHURCHYARD BELONGING TO THE CHURCH. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HERITAGE AND CONSERVATION OF THE CHURCH BUILDING AND ITS ENVIRONMENT. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE, ‘CHURCH BUILDING’ REFERS TO ST PETER AND ST PAUL EWHURST WHICH IS A CHURCH WITHIN THE PARISH OF EWHURST WITH OKEWOOD AND FOREST GREEN IN THE DIOCESE OF GUILDFORD, SURREY WHICH IS A GRADE I LISTED BUILDING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 LARKFIELD
EWHURST
CRANLEIGH
GU6 7QU
- Phone:
- 01483268694
- Email:
- secretary.fspsp@gmail.com
- Website:
-
friendsofewhurstchurch.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window