Trustees THE OUTHOUSE

Charity number: 1204555
Charity reporting is up to date (84 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LINDSEY ILSLEY Trustee 15 July 2024
The OutHouse
Received: On time
Janu Miah Trustee 15 July 2024
The OutHouse
Received: On time
Nicola Goodchild Trustee 01 September 2023
The OutHouse
Received: On time
Faye Nora Edwards Trustee 01 September 2023
The OutHouse
Received: On time
JAMES SILVERSTONE Trustee 17 July 2023
None on record
JORDAN ALEXANDER NEWELL Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record
Steve Mannix Trustee 11 April 2022
The OutHouse
Received: On time