NAQSHBANDIYYA ASLAMIYYA SPIRITUAL WELFARE ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
N/A
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 09 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Pakistan
Governance
- 10 September 2021: CIO registration
- NASWO (Working name)
- NAQSHBANDIYYA ASLAMIYYA SPIRITUAL WELFARE ORGANISATION (Previous name)
- NAQSHBANDIYYA ASLAMIYYA SPRITUAL WELFARE ORGANISATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RIAZ AHMAD ASLAM | Chair | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Majid Khan | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Razzaq | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Junaid | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 09/09/2022 | 09/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £104.45k | £172.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.05k | £291.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 09 September 2023 | 27 November 2024 | 141 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2023 | 27 November 2024 | 141 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 09 September 2022 | 16 October 2023 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 09 September 2022 | 16 October 2023 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 10 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
A. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE QURAN, SUNNAH, BEING THE WAY OF LIFE PRESCRIBED AS NORMATIVE FOR MUSLIMS ON THE BASIS OF TH TEACHINGS AND PRACTICES OF THE HOLY PROPHET (SALLALLAHU ALAYHI WASALLAM) IN THE LIGHT OF HANAFI SCHOOL OF THOUGHT AND WITH FURTHER CONSIDERATION TO SUFI TRADITIONS, BELIEFS AND INTERPRETATIONS OF THE NAQSHBANDI MUJADADI ASLAMI SUFI ORDER. B. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD PRAYERS, MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATIONS OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, AND SUPPORT ORGANISATIONS AT LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL LEVELS WHICH PROMOTE HARMONY AND UNDERSTANDING AMONGST DIFFERENT COMMUNITIES AND FAITH GROUPS AND WHICH HELP POOR AND NEEDY MUSLIMS AROUND THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NAQSHBANDIYYA ASLAMIYYAH
78 PRINGLE STREET
BLACKBURN
BB1 1SA
- Phone:
- 07739416697
- Email:
- riaz.ahmad.aslam@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window