LLANELLI MIND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND THE SAFEGUARDING OF MENTAL HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER IN ASSOCIATION WITH MIND (NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF MIND. To provide a 'Befriending Scheme' to people in the County of Carmarthenshire who have mental health problems.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2015
Total income includes £136,065 from government contract(s) and £10,705 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Carmarthenshire
Governance
- 04 December 1986: Standard registration
- 25 January 2016: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 25 January 2016: Funds transferred to 1161335 LLANELLI MIND
- LLANELLI MIND BEFRIENDING SCHEME (Working name)
- LLANELLI MIND WELCOME CENTER (Working name)
- LLANELLI MIND WELCOME CENTRE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/07/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.31k | £100.19k | £117.65k | £102.35k | £181.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £110.40k | £104.72k | £106.11k | £118.09k | £177.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £136.07k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 19 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | 19 January 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 12 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 12 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 07 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 07 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 10 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 10 January 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOVEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND THE SAFEGUARDING OF MENTAL HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM MENTAL DISORDER IN ASSOCIATION WITH MIND (NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR MENTAL HEALTH) IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF MIND.
Area of benefit
LLANELLI DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window