FRIENDS OF THE THEATRE ON THE ROW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our intent is to establish and maintain an open-air performance space in Lane End , Buckinghamshire, for the use of residents and visitors. We plan to turn an under-used open space into a relatively low cost venue for amateur performers, schools and youth clubs to stage and watch events. Our current activities centre on raising awareness and support through free open air community performances.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 07 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KATHLEEN GILL | Chair | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Beck | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ceri Nicolson | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.56k | £15 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.11k | £207 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 15 July 2024 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN OPEN-AIR THEATRE IN LANE END, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE, FOR THE USE OF RESIDENTS AND VISITORS. THIS WILL BE ACHIEVED BY TURNING AN UNDER-USED OPEN SPACE INTO A RELATIVELY LOW-COST VENUE FOR AMATEUR PERFORMERS, SCHOOLS AND YOUTH GROUPS TO STAGE AND WATCH LIVE EVENTS, PROVIDING A PLATFORM FOR CULTURAL ACTIVITY AND FOR CREATIVE LEARNING AND ENCOURAGING ACCESS TO, ENGAGEMENT WITH AND PARTICIPATION AND CREATIVITY IN THE PERFORMING ARTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HALL HOUSE
FININGS ROAD
LANE END
HIGH WYCOMBE
HP14 3EU
- Phone:
- 07875972867
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window