SALTASH BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In fulfilling the Purpose, the Church will engage in a range of Activities either on its own or with others that will vary from time to time with Activities being initiated, expanded, or closed, as appropriate
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Plymouth City
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Timothy John Parkman | Chair | 01 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Hodge | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Richard Lang | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Jean Bonner | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Davies | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Jane Beckett | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Katie Grace Spanner | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Marion Jannetta | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Joy Crump | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patrick McLaughlin | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £95.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £104.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 28 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE:- THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SALTASH BAPTIST CHURCH
CULVER ROAD
SALTASH
PL12 4DR
- Phone:
- 01752849948
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window