THE KANZEN FAMILY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity makes grants to organisations and individuals for relief of poverty, social and community development , and other charitable purposes for public benefit in the UK, Israel and the rest of the world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 March 2022: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachamim Kanzen | Chair | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE KANZEN | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Kanzen | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dahlia Kanzen | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £395.83k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.85k | £91.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07 FEB 2022
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE INCLUDING RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, AND DISTRESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE JEWISH FAITH, THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES, FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, ISRAEL AND THE WORLD, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ODELIAH HOUSE
1 NEW BRENT STREET
LONDON
NW4 2DF
- Phone:
- 02082029000
- Email:
- jbk@slade-kempton.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window