VISUAL IMPAIRMENT NORTH EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to raise awareness of visual impairment through training packages. The package product gives a simulation of various eye conditions and the difficulties faced by visual impaired people in their everyday living. We also aim to assist visually impaired people living in the North East of England by awarding grants twice a year.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £20,140 from 68 government contract(s)
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cumbria
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 30 December 1986: Standard registration
- VINE (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jonathan Bramley | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Maxwell Garvey | Trustee | 15 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.55k | £56.50k | £49.20k | £79.69k | £75.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.13k | £37.73k | £43.11k | £57.41k | £55.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.38k | £20.14k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £26.08k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 NOVEMBER 1986 AS AMENDED 9TH JULY 2002
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF VISUALLY IMPAIRED PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS, OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITHIN THE NORTH EAST REGION OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST REGION OF ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
VISUAL IMPAIRMENT NORTH EAST
29 Westoe Road
SOUTH SHIELDS
NE33 4LS
- Phone:
- 01912579026
- Email:
- vinesimspecs@yahoo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window