SUNDERLAND SAMBA FC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sunderland Samba FC is a community football club providing football, volunteering, coaching, youth work and international exchange opportunities. We are a youth led organisation enabling children and young people to make a positive contribution in their local community. We welcome supporters and volunteers to join our amazing team both in the UK and Kenya.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sunderland
- Kenya
Governance
- 09 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Wanjiru Bibi | Trustee | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Babatunde Sobitan | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ola Tony-Obot | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Priscilla Sobitan | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BOYD | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.87k | £43.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.67k | £28.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE; 3.1 FOR THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN NAIROBI, KENYA BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF THE NECESSARY SUPPORT TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT. 3.2 THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FOOTBALL. 3.3 TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY. 3.4 THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS.; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL AND RELIGIOUS GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS AND DIFFERENT FAITHS; IN ALL CASES WORKING IN CITY OF SUNDERLAND AND KENYA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Co-op Centre
White House Road
Sunderland
SR2 8AH
- Phone:
- 07751944500
- Email:
- sunderland.samba@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window