SADAQAH JARIYAH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(a) the prevention and relief of absolute or relative poverty, (b) the advancement of the faith and religious practices of Islam, including and not limited by monetary grants, payments or in-kind aid for individuals, charities, educational trusts, or other organisations working towards the same objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 16 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HUSSAIN AHMED | Chair | 25 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Saif Sharif Muhammad | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Saleh Ahmed | Trustee | 25 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.91k | £9.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.29k | £4.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 07 March 2024 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
(A) THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF ABSOLUTE OR RELATIVE POVERTY, (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE FAITH AND RELIGIOUS PRACTICES OF ISLAM, INCLUDING AND NOT LIMITED BY MONETARY GRANTS, PAYMENTS OR IN-KIND AID FOR INDIVIDUALS, CHARITIES, EDUCATIONAL TRUSTS, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TOWARDS THE SAME OBJECTIVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Bell Yard
London
WC2A 2JR
- Phone:
- 07908019470
- Email:
- info@sadaqahjariyah.org
- Website:
-
sadaqahjariyah.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window