OLLERTON EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As described in the classification section
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 18 February 1987: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN WILFRED ROBERTS | Chair | 01 January 1992 |
|
|
||||
Robert Weston | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brian Coutts | Trustee | 06 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew George Littler | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|||||
Brian Stanley Mellor | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £779 | £67 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £454 | £4.85k | £22.92k | £1.85k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 22 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 28 MARCH 1986
Charitable objects
(A) PROVIDING FOR ANY SCHOOL IN THE PARISH OF OLLERTON OR SUBSTANTIALLY SERVING THE SAME SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE AGREED BETWEEN THE TRUSTEES AND THE GOVERNORS OF THE SCHOOL CONCERNED. (B) PROMOTING THE EDUCATION, INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING OR PERSONS IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE WHO ARE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS AND WHO ARE OR HAVE A PARENT RESIDENT IN THE SAID PARISH. (FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 19 OF THE SCHEME).
Area of benefit
PARISH OF OLLERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Oak Farm
School Lane
Ollerton
KNUTSFORD
Cheshire
WA16 8SQ
- Phone:
- 01565 653995
- Email:
- oakfarm@talktalk.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window