ROSE HILL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rose Hill School Parents Association organises and hosts fundraising events and activities to fund projects and purchase equipment that will further enhance the education of the pupils. Such events and activities include school fairs, discos, film and quiz nights. All activities take place on the school's premises.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
Governance
- 28 June 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Dellar | Chair | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Nicola Morgan | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dana Lorraine Rothenberg | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.46k | £25.81k | £39.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.82k | £26.19k | £38.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 21 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JUN 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION (THE OBJECTS) IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROSE HILL PARENTS ASSOCIATION
ROSE HILL SCHOOL
CONISTON AVENUE
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN4 9SY
- Phone:
- 01892525591
- Email:
- pa@rosehillschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window