LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ALEXANDRA HOSPITAL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising to provide equipment, amenities, education and comforts for the welfare and benefit of patients at the Alexandra Hospital Redditch
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 19 December 1986: Standard registration
- 27 May 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 27 May 2021: Funds transferred to 1184967 LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ALEXANDRA HOSPITAL
- ALEXANDRA LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Working name)
- LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF THE ALEXANDRA HOSPTIAL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | 31/07/2018 | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £296.87k | £275.17k | £228.57k | £158.60k | £69.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £233.86k | £266.20k | £146.36k | £205.59k | £423.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 21 May 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 02 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 02 April 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2018 | 22 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2018 | 22 May 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 08 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | 08 November 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JULY 1986 AS AMENDED 15 SEPTEMBER 1987.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED HANDICAPPED, INFIRM OR IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND, GENERALLY, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE ALEXANDRA HOSPITAL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window