THE NICK KILHAMS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We receive donations to help promote better mental health within the London Insurance Market
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 February 2022: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy John Bradford | Chair | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Sprent | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
James Esdaile | Trustee | 07 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katy Jayne Beechey | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Hovey | Trustee | 02 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martin Robert Davidson Reith | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Michael Powell | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ann Kilhams | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 25 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11 JUN 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 01 FEB 2022
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH AND RELIEF OF NEED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND WITH A FOCUS ON THE WORKPLACE ENVIRONMENT OF THE LONDON (RE) INSURANCE MARKET BY: -RAISING AWARENESS OF MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES -WORKING TO PROVIDE OPPORTUNITIES FOR EARLY SUPPORT FOR THOSE AFFECTED BY SUICIDAL THOUGHTS AND INCIDENTS OF SUICIDE VIA OPEN AND HONEST DIALOGUE -WORKING WITH CHARITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO PROVIDE HELP TO THOSE AFFECTED BY SUICIDAL THOUGHTS AND TO PROVIDE SUPPORT TO FAMILIES BEREAVED BY SUICIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4TH FLOOR
100 FENCHURCH STREET
LONDON
EC3M 5JD
- Phone:
- 02078128474
- Email:
- trustees@kilhams.foundation
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window