Trustees ROSSENDALE AND PENDLE MOUNTAIN RESCUE TEAM

Charity Number: 1195415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Simpson Chair 01 April 1993
None on record
Gail Todd Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Maurice Robinson Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Graham Dalley Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Malcolm Armstrong Trustee 01 August 2020
None on record
Elisha Eddy Trustee 01 July 2016
None on record
Paul Harris Trustee 01 April 2007
None on record
Peter Goble Trustee 01 January 2001
None on record