SALISBURY STINGRAYS SWIMMING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Salisbury Stingrays Swimming Club exists to help support people in achieving their goals in the sport of swimming. This is achieved with the aid of high-quality coaching, teaching and support staff, working in partnership with the club officials, parents and most importantly, the swimmers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 03 December 2021: CIO registration
- SALISBURY STINGRAYS (Working name)
- Salisbury Stingrays Amateur Swimming Club (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natasha Falkner | Chair | 10 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Grant | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mel Gosse | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Candi Soames | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chris Backhouse | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gavin Mills | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Ellis | Trustee | 04 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jon Tribbeck | Trustee | 10 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £278.64k | £235.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £209.77k | £222.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 03 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Dec 2021 as amended on 04 Mar 2024 as amended on 04 Mar 2024
Charitable objects
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation, primarily but not exclusively, for the benefit of the inhabitants of Salisbury and the surrounding areas by the provision of teaching, development, competitive activities, swimming and associated activities.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SALISBURY STINGRAYS SWIMMING CLUB
FIVE RIVERS CENTRE LEISURE CENTRE
HULSE ROAD
SALISBURY
SP1 3NR
- Phone:
- 01722 434760
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window