CHRISTCHURCH AND DISTRICT ARTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
CADArts produces an Arts Directory and Diary for events to publicise arts and crafts activities in the Christchurch, area. The committee arrange arts, crafts and performing events to showcase members' work to the public in a wide variety of venues. We organise at least one event a year open to the public, with a competitive element to encourage artists to improve the standard of their work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Poole
Governance
- 25 August 2021: CIO registration
- 26 May 2022: Funds received from 1000984 CHRISTCHURCH AND DISTRICT ARTS
- CADARTS (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Mary Patterson | Chair | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dudley Smith | Trustee | 19 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mairead Tindall | Trustee | 19 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Denise Law | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANET MURIEL TOWNEND | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Rachael Corbin | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
JEAN MCCLOY JONES | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Mary Dinmore | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.20k | £10.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.75k | £12.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 25 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF ARTISTIC TASTE AND THE KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF CHRISTCHURCH AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Somerford Way
Purewell
Christchurch
Dorset
BH23 3QN
- Phone:
- 01202 483519
- Email:
- secretary@cadarts.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window