Accounts and annual returns GOD FIELD DELIVERANCE MINISTRIES (GFDM)

Charity number: 1195219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2024 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2023 31 October 2024 93 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2022 25 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not Required