WEST DORSET WILDING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
West Dorset Wilding aim to restore nature in West Dorset through working with farmers and landowner to restore land and ecosystems that have been degraded biologically. We also are looking to engage the wider public as much as possible and help people reconnect with nature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 07 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VISCOUNT LUKE TIMOTHY CHARLES MONTAGU | Chair | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Luke Measures | Trustee | 17 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Tarsha Finney | Trustee | 09 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sir Philip Colfox | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Arthur Percy Crutchley | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.47k | £30.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.90k | £37.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 07 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY AND RESTORING DEGRADED ECOLOGICAL SYSTEMS. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 10C
Pineapple Business Park
Pineapple Lane
Salwayash
BRIDPORT
Dorset
- Phone:
- 07876157522
- Email:
- info@westdorsetwilding.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window