BEIRUT FOR THE ETHICAL TREATMENT OF ANIMALS (BETA) UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Founded in 2004 we are a charity based in Beirut, Lebanon, which rescues and rehomes stray cats and dogs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Lebanon
Governance
- 12 August 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Glyn Alan Barrett PhD | Chair | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lynda King | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Celeste Mott | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alice Dunn | Trustee | 15 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 23 December 2024 | 322 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 23 December 2024 | 322 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 12 Aug 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO RELIEVING THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS AND PROMOTING HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS ANIMALS, BY MAKING GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
72 THE AVENUE
MORTIMER COMMON
READING
RG7 3QX
- Phone:
- 01183788893
- Email:
- Glyn.barrett@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window