PUNCHBAG ART GALLERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PunchBag Art Gallery Charity, located in the London Borough of Redbridge, champions christian contemporary art, cultural diversity, focusing on BAME artists and communities. As a volunteer-run, independent gallery, we're dedicated to cultivating artistic appreciation across all backgrounds. We uniquely collaborate with local communities, educational institutions and businesses to integrate art.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 16 November 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Williams MA | Chair | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Isabella Neilsen-Williams BA | Trustee | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 30 March 2024 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 30 March 2024 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN, AND RAISE PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF, THE CREATIVE ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO AFRICAN, CARIBBEAN AND EUROPEAN MODERN AND HISTORICAL FINE CHRISTIAN ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ART GALLERY AND EXHIBITION SPACE, AND BY MEANS OF BUT NOT LIMITED TO: • THE PROVISION OF SHORT EDUCATIONAL COURSES AND WORKSHOPS; • TEACHING, TRAINING AND ENHANCING SKILLS OF INDIVIDUALS TO ENABLE THEM TO PRODUCE ARTISTIC WORK OF A HIGHER STANDARD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Studio
1A Granville Road
Ilford
IG1 4JY
- Phone:
- 07398086785
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window