THE FRIENDS OF ST AGNES AND ST PANCRAS CHURCH

Charity number: 518343
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides monies for the purchase of any items in connection with the religious activities

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £27
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Liverpool City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 March 1988: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE FRIENDS OF ST AGNES (Working name)
  • THE FRIENDS OF ST AGNES AND ST PANCRAS, TOXTETH PARK, LIVERPOOL (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dorothea Katharine Cox Trustee 13 January 2025
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £600 £610 £1 £3 £27
Total expenditure £610 £1.00k £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 05 February 2025 97 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 February 2025 463 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 05 February 2025 828 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1280 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1280 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1645 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1645 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
43 MANVERS ROAD
LIVERPOOL
L16 3NP
Phone:
01517381725
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available