POWERCITY INTERNATIONAL UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the purpose of the charity (the church), is to preach and teach the Gospel of Jesus Christ.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Croydon
- Enfield
- Greenwich
- Manchester City
- Slough
- Canada
- Ireland
- Nigeria
- United States
Governance
- 20 June 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDNA ROSE IKEMHON BORODE | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
SOPHINA IRHAGBON OBOH | Trustee | 05 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.90k | £8.64k | £14.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.41k | £10.20k | £12.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 June 2024 | 231 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 June 2024 | 231 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY TEACHING, TRAINING AND EQUIPPING CHRISTIANS IN KNOWING; 1. WHO THEY ARE IN CHRIST, 2. WHAT THEY HAVE IN CHRIST, AND 3. WHAT CHRIST CAN DO THROUGH THEM. THE CIO IS DEDICATED TO THE ADVANCEMENT AND/OR BROADCASTING OF ACCURATE BIBLICAL TRUTH TEACHINGS AND DOCTRINES RELATING TO ALL ASPECTS OF THE GOSPEL OF CHRIST JESUS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
42 NORTHERN ROAD
SLOUGH
SL2 1PB
- Phone:
- +447710785171
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window